|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 532, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 8. Page 3063.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2343.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 10. Page 1651.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on W., P. & W. and TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|