California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB629 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/06/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 629CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 267 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 6, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 6, 2011 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 22, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 19, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 4, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Monning FEBRUARY 16, 2011 An act to amend Section 1450.1 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 629, Monning. Veterans cemetery. Existing law requires the Department of Veterans Affairs, in voluntary cooperation with the Board of Supervisors of the County of Monterey, the City of Seaside, the Fort Ord Reuse Authority, and local agencies to design, develop, and construct the California Central Coast Veterans Cemetery at Fort Ord, as specified. The State Contract Act requires projects that are not under the jurisdiction of specified departments to be under the charge and control of the Department of General Services. This bill would authorize the Department of Veterans Affairs to enter into an agreement with the Fort Ord Reuse Authority for the veterans cemetery project to be under the sole charge and direct control of the authority. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1450.1 of the Military and Veterans Code is amended to read: 1450.1. (a) Pursuant to this chapter, the department, in voluntary cooperation with the Board of Supervisors of the County of Monterey, the City of Seaside, the Fort Ord Reuse Authority, and surrounding counties, cities, and local agencies, shall design, develop, and construct the state-owned and state-operated veterans cemetery, which shall be located on the site of the former Fort Ord. (b) The department shall oversee and coordinate the design, development, construction, and equipping of the veterans cemetery. (c) It is the intent of the Legislature that the design of the veterans cemetery closely follows the concepts published in the California Central Coast Veterans Cemetery Fort Ord Development Master Plan as prepared for the Monterey County Redevelopment Agency. (d) Notwithstanding Section 10107 of the Public Contract Code, and as authorized by Section 67679 of the Government Code, in fulfilling the requirements of subdivision (a), the department may enter into an agreement with the Fort Ord Reuse Authority for the project under subdivision (a) to be under the sole charge and direct control of the veterans cemetery public works project.