LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB63
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB63
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB63
Action History
06/29/2011
From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
03/29/2011
In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
03/16/2011
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
01/27/2011
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and V.A.
01/03/2011
Read first time.
12/10/2010
From printer. May be heard in committee January 9.
12/09/2010
Introduced. To print.