|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 773, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6093.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 4587.).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, urgency clause adopted, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 3767.).
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wright.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by Committee.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 982.)
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|