California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB633 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/22/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 633AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 22, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 23, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Olsen (Coauthors: Assembly Members Block, Jeffries, and Mansoor) (Coauthor: Senator Runner) FEBRUARY 16, 2011 An act to amend Section 13332.09 of the Government Code, relating to state government  , and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately  . LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 633, as amended, Olsen. California State University: acquisition or replacement of motor vehicles. (1) Under existing law, the Department of General Services exercises oversight of the acquisition and replacement of motor vehicles by state agencies. As of July 1, 2012, "state agencies" will be defined for these purposes to include each campus of the California State University. This bill would delete the reference to each campus of the California State University from the definition of state agencies under these provisions. (2) Existing law requires, until July 1, 2012, the Trustees of the California State University to report to the Legislature on their motor vehicle procurement, to include specified information, on or before June 30 of each year. This bill would, commencing July 1, 2012, require the trustees to report to the Legislature on their motor vehicle procurement, to include specified information, including some information required under existing law, on or before June 30 of each year, up to and including June 30, 2017. The bill would also require the trustees, to the greatest extent feasible, to purchase vehicles using statewide commodity contracts.  (3) This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute.  Vote:  majority   2/3  . Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 13332.09 of the Government Code, as added by Section 4 of Chapter 679 of the Statutes of 2007, is amended to read: 13332.09. (a) No purchase order or other form of documentation for acquisition or replacement of motor vehicles shall be issued against any appropriation until the Department of General Services has investigated and established the necessity therefor. (b) A state agency may not acquire surplus mobile equipment from any source for program support until the Department of General Services has investigated and established the necessity therefor. (c) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, all contracts for the acquisition of motor vehicles or general use mobile equipment for a state agency shall be made by or under the supervision of the Department of General Services. Pursuant to Section 10298 of the Public Contract Code, the Department of General Services may collect a fee to offset the cost of the services provided. (d) All passenger-type motor vehicles purchased for state officers and employees, except constitutional officers, shall be American-made vehicles of the light class, as defined by the California Victim Compensation and Government Claims Board, unless excepted by the Director of General Services on the basis of unusual requirements, including, but not limited to, use by the California Highway Patrol, that would justify the need for a motor vehicle of a heavier class. (e) No general use mobile equipment having an original purchase price of twenty-five thousand dollars ($25,000) or more shall be rented or leased from a nonstate source and payment therefor made from any appropriation for the use of the Department of Transportation, without the prior approval of the Department of General Services after a determination that comparable state-owned equipment is not available, unless obtaining approval would endanger life or property, in which case the transaction and the justification for not having sought prior approval shall be reported immediately thereafter to the Department of General Services. (f) (1) The Trustees of the California State University shall, to the greatest extent feasible, purchase vehicles using statewide commodity contracts. (2) The trustees shall report to the Legislature on or before June 30 of each year up to and including June 30, 2017, on their motor vehicle procurement, including both of the following: (A) An inventory, by campus, of motor vehicles that includes the type of vehicle, consistent with the fleet asset management system reports. (B) The number of motor vehicles purchased during the prior fiscal year, disaggregated by campus and type of vehicle if the passenger vehicle or truck was purchased through statewide commodity contracts, and the purchase price. (g) As used in this section: (1) "General use mobile equipment" means equipment that is listed in the Mobile Equipment Inventory of the State Equipment Council and that is capable of being used by more than one state agency, and shall not be deemed to refer to equipment having a practical use limited to the controlling state agency only. Section 575 of the Vehicle Code shall have no application to this section. (2) "State agency" means a state agency, as defined pursuant to Section 11000. The University of California is requested and encouraged to have the Department of General Services perform the tasks identified in this section with respect to the acquisition or replacement of motor vehicles by the University of California. (h) This section shall become operative on July 1, 2012.  SEC. 2.   This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are:   In order to ensure the continuation of the use of statewide commodity contracts in the purchase of vehicles by the Trustees of the California State University, it is necessary for this act to take effect immediately.