|
02/01/2012
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Measure version as amended on January 12 corrected.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (January 10).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|