California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB648 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2011

Amended

Bill August 15, 2011
Bill July 6, 2011
Bill June 20, 2011
Bill April 6, 2011