06/08/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Held without recommendation. | |||
05/12/2011 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/02/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/02/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1177.) | |||
04/14/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
04/13/2011 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |||
04/04/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/31/2011 | Read second time and amended. | |||
03/30/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 29). | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
02/17/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |||
02/16/2011 | Read first time. To print. |