|
09/01/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 204, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1975.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1354.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Measure version as amended on March 21 corrected.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|