|
08/22/2012
|
In committee: that the measure be held in committee pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4444.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3607.)
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|