02/01/2012 | Died on inactive file. | |||
05/26/2011 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Block. | |||
05/05/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/04/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 3). | |||
05/02/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
04/28/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/12/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/29/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
02/17/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |||
02/16/2011 | Read first time. To print. |