|
08/03/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 164, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1864.).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1435.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|