California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB678 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2011

Amended

Bill August 15, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill March 25, 2011