06/29/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/08/2011 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
05/27/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/27/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 1582.) | |||
05/16/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |||
05/03/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
05/02/2011 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/28/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 27). | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Read first time. To print. |