02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/06/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
03/24/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
01/27/2011 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
01/03/2011 | Read first time. | |||
12/15/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 14. | |||
12/14/2010 | Introduced. To print. |