|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2356.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 702.)
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|