|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 1462.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|