|
08/04/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 176, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 1854.).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 1339.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|