|
10/04/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 462, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3185.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2351.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Measure version as amended on July 12 corrected.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1354.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|