California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB69 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2011

Amended

Bill August 30, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011