|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 682, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2080.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 1738.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|