BILL NUMBER: AB 693AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 30, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 28, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 12, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Huffman ( Coauthors: Assembly Members Ammiano, Blumenfield, Gorell, Jeffries, and Portantino ) ( Coauthor: Senator Berryhill ) FEBRUARY 17, 2011 An act to add Section 4150.3 to the Vehicle Code, relating to anatomical gifts amend Section 181016 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Sonoma County Regional Climate Protection Authority . LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 693, as amended, Huffman. Vehicle registration: organ and tissue donation. Local government: Sonoma County Regional Climate Protection Authority. (1) Existing law, until December 1, 2015, creates the Sonoma County Regional Climate Protection Authority (authority). Existing law provides for the authority to be governed by the same board as that governing the Sonoma County Transportation Authority and imposes certain duties on the authority. Existing law authorizes the authority, in cooperation with local agencies, as defined, that elect to participate, to perform coordination and implementation activities, within the boundaries of the County of Sonoma, to assist those agencies in meeting their greenhouse gas emissions reduction goals and develop, coordinate, and implement programs and policies to comply with the California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006 and other federal or state mandates and programs designed to respond to greenhouse gas emissions and climate change. This bill would instead make the above provisions inoperative on December 1, 2019, and would repeal them as of January 1, 2020. By extending the addition of new duties on local governments participating in the Sonoma County Regional Climate Protection Authority, this bill would impose a state-mandated local program. (2) The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. The Uniform Anatomical Gift Act regulates the making of anatomical gifts and the disposition of donated bodies and body parts. Existing law authorizes the creation of a nonprofit entity designated as the California Organ and Tissue Donor Registrar, which is required to establish and maintain the California Organ and Tissue Donor Registry. Existing law requires the Department of Motor Vehicles, upon issuance of a new driver's license or a renewal of a driver's license or the issuance of an identification card, to provide information on organ and tissue donation, including a standardized form to be filled out by an individual who desires to enroll in the California Organ and Tissue Donor Registry with instructions for mailing the completed form to the California Organ and Tissue Donor Registrar, and including a donor dot that may be affixed to the new driver's license or identification card. Existing law also provides that a person who applies for an original or renewal driver's license or identification card may designate a voluntary contribution of $2 for the purpose of promoting and supporting organ and tissue donation. This bill would require the department to add a graphic hyperlink to the confirmation page of vehicle registrations processed online in order to provide the option for a registrant to connect to the state-authorized Donate Life California online California Organ and Tissue Donor Registry and would authorize that person to make a voluntary contribution, as specified, to the registry for the purpose of promoting and supporting organ and tissue donation. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no yes . THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 181016 of the Public Utilities Code is amended to read: 181016. This division shall become inoperative on December 1, 2015 2019 , and, as of January 1, 2016 2020 , is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1, 2016 2020 , deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed. SEC. 2. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code. SECTION 1. Section 4150.3 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 4150.3. (a) The Department of Motor Vehicles shall add a graphic hyperlink to the confirmation page of vehicle registrations processed online, providing the option for registrants to connect to the state-authorized Donate Life California online California Organ and Tissue Donor Registry established pursuant to subdivision (a) of Section 7150.90 of the Health and Safety Code. (b) A person who has connected to the state-authorized Donate Life California online California Organ and Tissue Donor Registry via the hyperlink required by subdivision (a) may make a voluntary contribution for the purpose of promoting and supporting organ and tissue donation. This contribution shall be treated as a voluntary contribution to the California Organ and Tissue Donor Registry and not as a fee for the issuance of vehicle registration. (c) Enrollment in the registry online shall constitute a legal document under the Uniform Anatomical Gift Act (Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 7150) of Part 1 of Division 7 of the Health and Safety Code) and shall remain binding after the donor's death despite any express desires of next of kin opposed to the donation. (d) Information obtained by the registrar for the purposes of this subdivision shall be used for these purposes only and shall not be disseminated further by the registrar. (e) A public entity or employee shall not be liable for any loss, detriment, or injury resulting directly or indirectly from false or inaccurate information contained in the form provided pursuant to this section.