California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB693 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill July 6, 2012
Bill May 30, 2012
Bill April 28, 2011
Bill April 12, 2011