California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB696 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2011

Amended

Bill June 28, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill May 10, 2011