09/14/2011 | From Senate committee without further action. | |||
09/10/2011 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
07/05/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |||
06/21/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/19/2011 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/05/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/05/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 1. Page 1234.) | |||
04/14/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/13/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |||
03/29/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/25/2011 | Read second time and amended. | |||
03/24/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (March 22). | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Read first time. To print. |