06/14/2012 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
01/26/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
01/26/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 3602.) | |||
01/24/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/23/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
01/19/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 19). | |||
01/19/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
01/10/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
01/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
01/05/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |||
05/03/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/26/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
01/03/2011 | Read first time. | |||
12/17/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 16. | |||
12/16/2010 | Introduced. To print. |