|
09/07/2011
|
Measure version as amended on September 1 corrected.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2314.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rules 61(a)(10) and 61(a)(12) were dispensed with. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2075.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1178.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|