|
10/04/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 463, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2627.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2010.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1449.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 30).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|