08/15/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
07/05/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/23/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |||
06/08/2011 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |||
05/31/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/31/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1637.) | |||
05/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/06/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
03/16/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
01/27/2011 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
01/03/2011 | Read first time. | |||
12/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 20. | |||
12/20/2010 | Introduced. To print. |