BILL NUMBER: AB 712CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 576 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE OCTOBER 8, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR OCTOBER 8, 2011 PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 7, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 8, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 11, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 31, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Williams (Coauthor: Senator Simitian) FEBRUARY 17, 2011 An act to add Section 14583 to the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 712, Williams. Recycling: beverage containers. The California Beverage Container Recycling and Litter Reduction Act requires a distributor to pay a redemption payment for each beverage container sold or offered for sale to the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery. The act requires the Division of Recycling in the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery, subject to the availability of funds, to expend specified moneys set aside in the California Beverage Container Recycling Fund, for specified purposes relating to the recycling of beverage containers. This bill would, notwithstanding the above expenditure requirement, prohibit the department, on and after July 1, 2012, from making any payments, grants, or loans, as provided, to a city, county, or city and county, if the city, county, or city and county has adopted or is enforcing a land use restriction that prevents the siting or operation of a certified recycling center at a supermarket site, as defined, as may be required pursuant to a specified law. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14583 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read: 14583. Notwithstanding Section 14581, on and after July 1, 2012, the department shall not make any payments, grants, or loans, as provided in that section, to a city, county, or city and county, if the city, county, or city and county has adopted or is enforcing a land use restriction that prevents the siting or operation of a certified recycling center at a supermarket site, as defined in Section 14526.6, as may be required pursuant to Section 14571.