|
07/25/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 105, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1687.).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1393.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|