LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB721
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB721
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB721
Action History
02/01/2012
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
04/11/2011
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/21/2011
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/07/2011
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
02/18/2011
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
02/17/2011
Read first time. To print.