|
09/08/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2392.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 2368.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 1502.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|