|
08/25/2011
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 5.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 1740.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 4.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|