|
10/04/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 464, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 6. Page 2856.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 2168.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1588.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & E. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|