02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/18/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/13/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/05/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |||
04/04/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Read first time. To print. |