02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/10/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | |||
01/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |||
01/05/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. | |||
01/04/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |||
05/04/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Read first time. To print. |