|
08/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 23). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1355.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|