|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 615, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 5. Page 2914.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 2195.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 6. Page 1740.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|