09/06/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 221, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/06/2011 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
08/24/2011 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |||
08/18/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/18/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1975.). | |||
08/16/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
08/15/2011 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/28/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/12/2011 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/02/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/02/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1177.) | |||
04/13/2011 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |||
03/31/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Read first time. To print. |