|
09/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 269, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 2485.).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1960.).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 4. Page 1348.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2011
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/23/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 22.
|
|
|
|
12/22/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|