|
07/01/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 57, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:40 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1383.).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1170.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|