LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB755
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB755
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB755
Action History
02/01/2012
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
04/26/2011
In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
04/25/2011
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
04/05/2011
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/07/2011
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
02/18/2011
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
02/17/2011
Read first time. To print.