|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 714, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:35 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6528.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4883.).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4321.).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3604.)
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 10).
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3434.) (Pending re-referral to Com. on HEALTH.)
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|