06/28/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |||
05/19/2011 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
05/09/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/09/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1277.) | |||
05/05/2011 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1235.) | |||
04/14/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/13/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |||
04/05/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/24/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/23/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Read first time. To print. |