|
10/02/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2891.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2750.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 31).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2139.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1568.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|