08/25/2011 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
08/15/2011 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
07/06/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/16/2011 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |||
06/06/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/03/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 1856.) | |||
06/01/2011 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1691.) | |||
05/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/06/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
03/22/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Read first time. To print. |