|
09/01/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 206, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2385.).
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1865.).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1552.)
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1498.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|