02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/13/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/12/2011 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/11/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 5). | |||
03/29/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |||
02/17/2011 | Read first time. To print. |