LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB779
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB779
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB779
Action History
02/01/2012
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
05/11/2011
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/31/2011
Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
03/30/2011
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended.
03/17/2011
Referred to Coms. on W., P. & W. and L. GOV.
02/18/2011
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
02/17/2011
Read first time. To print.